Financial history THE CHRISTIAN WAY OF LIFE CHURCHES LIMITED

Charity number: 1160836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £19.20k £28.58k £9.12k £9.32k £8.72k
Total expenditure £19.07k £61.96k £58.13k £22.66k £19.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A