NORTH LONDON SPORTS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1158930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 March 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 March 2019 42 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 June 2017 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 June 2017 128 days late Download