NORTH LONDON SPORTS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1158930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.90k £9.50k £9.75k £8.50k £9.00k
Total expenditure £8.34k £9.00k £9.70k £8.20k £8.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.30k £4.50k N/A £4.00k N/A