Financial history SEAHAVEN WILDLIFE RESCUE

Charity number: 1163126
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/08/2017 12/08/2018 18/01/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.10k £6.21k £11.73k £5.15k £5.46k
Total expenditure £6.18k £5.39k £8.38k £10.04k £5.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A