NORTH DEAL COMMUNITY COMPANY CIO

Charity number: 1163274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download