NORTH DEAL COMMUNITY COMPANY CIO

Charity number: 1163274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £38.29k £45.88k £46.38k £47.06k £34.95k
Total expenditure £41.14k £41.81k £49.18k £50.36k £34.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.81k £5.19k