QUAKER CONGO PARTNERSHIP UK

Charity number: 1159781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL JOHN WATT MBE Trustee 01 January 2015
VOLUNTEER ACTION FOR PEACE Overdue by 113 days
THE NST DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
TIM BROWN Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
CATHERINE SARAH PUTZ Chair 01 January 2015 None on record
DR ALICK MUNRO Trustee 27 February 2018
RICHMOND UPON THAMES TALKING NEWSPAPER Received: On time
Andrew Gregory Trustee 19 November 2015 None on record
MARGARET GREGORY Trustee 01 January 2015
SOCIETY OF FRIENDS - HARDSHAW ESTATES CHARITIES Received: On time
Paul Michael Simon Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record
NICK TISCHLER Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
DR Lynn Patricia Norbury Trustee 22 February 2017 None on record
HANNAH MORROW Trustee 01 November 2015 None on record