Financial history SUB-SAHARA ADVISORY PANEL

Charity number: 1159990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £97.90k £68.64k £115.90k £212.98k £152.40k
Total expenditure £67.12k £98.19k £99.08k £161.88k £150.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.53k
Income from government grants £46.85k N/A £30.86k £42.54k N/A