Trustees THE LIBERAL JEWISH SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1159292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Scott Dinwiddie Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Tsvetyana Petrova Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Jennifer Nathan MBE Trustee 22 June 2022
NECESSITOUS LADIES' FUND
Received: On time
Gabrielle Lazarus Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Anthony Sefton Trustee 10 June 2021
None on record
David Howard Adams Trustee 11 July 2019
None on record
Simon Van Someren Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Harriett Faith Goldenberg Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
Susan Bolsom-Morris Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
David Nicholas Rigal MBE Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
Benita Plax Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record