OLD KAMPALA ALUMNI SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1159825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time Download