OLD KAMPALA ALUMNI SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 1159825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £27.95k £28.92k £17.45k £15.87k £14.30k
Total expenditure £14.18k £13.45k £7.62k £14.19k £2.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A