COLOGNE ROAD COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1159949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.56k £1.20k £4.91k £2.17k £18.87k
Total expenditure £1.73k £1.02k £7.32k £5.81k £2.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £18.50k