Accounts and annual returns BUBBENHALL COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1159271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 March 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required