THE WATLINGTON CLUB CIO

Charity number: 1160612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £85.35k £123.69k £120.81k £109.76k £107.72k
Total expenditure £82.10k £121.98k £119.22k £97.17k £85.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £32.94k £16.73k £8.79k N/A