LEDBURY AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 505102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.13k £5.01k £8.93k £1.42k £2.09k
Total expenditure £4.71k £5.64k £8.74k £1.77k £982
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A