TETTENHALL TRANSPORT HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity number: 1160431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £8.79k £16.38k £4.62k £5.64k £5.43k
Total expenditure £9.37k £23.25k £3.27k £4.45k £5.95k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A