ASYLUM ACADEMY FOR EXTREME SPORTS

Charity number: 1159288
Charity reporting is overdue by 70 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 70 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 70 days
Annual return 30 November 2019 14 October 2020 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 14 October 2020 14 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 19 March 2020 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 19 March 2020 171 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 25 October 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 05 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 25 October 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 25 October 2017 25 days late Download