REGATHER CHARITY

Charity number: 1159236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £15.35k £27.78k £9.92k £0 £0
Total expenditure £16.15k £23.33k £20.53k £1.06k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 N/A N/A N/A