COULSDON AND DISTRICT DAY NURSERY FUND

Charity number: 1160788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 March 2020 22 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2020 22 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 09 March 2019 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2019 04 February 2020 26 days late Download
Annual return 09 March 2018 02 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2018 06 February 2020 393 days late Download
Annual return 09 March 2017 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2017 06 February 2020 758 days late Download
Annual return 09 March 2016 22 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 March 2016 06 February 2020 1123 days late Download