COULSDON AND DISTRICT DAY NURSERY FUND

Charity number: 1160788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 09/03/2016 09/03/2017 09/03/2018 09/03/2019 09/03/2020
Total gross income £5.05k £5.05k £4.17k £9.89k £41.17k
Total expenditure £381 £393 £6.69k £15.28k £19.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A