Financial history QUBA TRUST

Charity number: 1159575
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/01/2017 24/01/2018 24/01/2019 24/01/2020 24/01/2021
Total gross income £41.54k £65.33k £83.15k £135.42k £329.61k
Total expenditure £35.49k £59.03k £91.36k £141.89k £230.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A