TANKERSLEY SENIOR CITIZENS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505208
Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 23/12/2013 23/12/2016 23/12/2017
Total gross income £2.86k £2.61k £2.59k £1.81k £2.23k
Total expenditure £1.72k £2.61k £2.55k £1.81k £2.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A