HENFIELD LEISURE CENTRE

Charity number: 1159054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ERIC JOHN HOLDER Chair 03 November 2014
DAME ELIZABETH GRESHAM'S CHARITIES Received: On time
HENFIELD BRANCH OF THE BADEN POWELL GUILD OF GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
Simon John Vickers Trustee 09 November 2016 None on record
Sebastian Bloxsome Trustee 20 January 2021 None on record
Gary Pettifer Trustee 23 September 2019 None on record
CONWAY FRANK THORNS Trustee 03 November 2014 None on record
BARRIE MITCHELL Trustee 03 November 2014 None on record
Adrian John Hillman Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
SHIRLEY MITCHELL Trustee 03 November 2014 None on record