Accounts and annual returns GUY'S AND ST THOMAS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window