Financial history GUY'S AND ST THOMAS' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £27.07m £24.06m £26.63m £28.49m £28.93m
Total expenditure £40.63m £35.61m £43.26m £45.75m £62.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.98m £4.80m £6.84m £10.98m £10.93m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £31.00k £24.00k £23.00k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.01m £19.22m £19.76m £17.51m £17.96m
Income - Other £41.00k £6.00k £8.00k £5.00k £30.00k
Income - Legacies £1.41m £566.00k £517.00k £1.16m £2.76m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £28.63m £21.76m £29.28m £34.69m £45.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.01m £13.85m £13.97m £11.05m £16.21m
Expenditure - Governance £26.00k £26.00k £31.00k £38.00k £41.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £18.34m £15.50m £17.68m £23.42m £28.83m
Expenditure - Investment management £10.17m £10.62m £9.84m £6.96m £11.33m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0