LEASEHOLD KNOWLEDGE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1162584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 15/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £0 £29.81k £16.89k £48.98k £21.63k
Total expenditure £0 £2.94k £59.33k £68.26k £91.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A