WE MIND THE GAP

Charity number: 1161504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RACHEL CLACHER Chair 31 March 2015 None on record
LOUISE GATENBY Trustee 26 November 2017 None on record
Emma Degg Trustee 01 February 2020 None on record
Karen Ann Jones Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
Kirsty Rogers Trustee 14 June 2019 None on record