PARK LANE STABLES RDA

Charity number: 1161306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 25 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 25 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 23 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required