Trustees OPTIONS FOR INTERNATIONAL HEALTH

Charity number: 1160066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Faith Mwangi-Powell Trustee 02 October 2020
None on record
SALLY HUGHES Trustee 19 February 2018
None on record
RICHARD BARRY JOHN BURGE Trustee 06 August 2014
None on record
CLAIRE EMMA MORRIS Trustee 20 July 2014
MSI REPRODUCTIVE CHOICES
Received: On time
JONATHAN GEOFFREY ELMS Trustee 18 July 2014
None on record
ALISON DEMBO RATH Trustee 18 July 2014
None on record