DAUBENEY PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1159228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 31/08/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020
Total gross income £4.25k £2.17k £1.30k £1.03k £333
Total expenditure £3.12k £3.02k £2.25k £1.67k £765
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A