THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN CHURCH WHEATLEY

Charity number: 1159100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £95.13k £81.70k £101.46k £106.14k £177.87k
Total expenditure £86.78k £80.27k £91.39k £94.83k £130.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £500 £500 £4.50k