Financial history NATIONAL COASTWATCH INSTITUTION

Charity number: 1159975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.58m £465.55k £531.19k £719.83k £542.18k
Total expenditure £525.54k £452.45k £501.46k £564.92k £516.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £532.95k N/A £301.69k £438.73k £346.26k
Income - Other trading activities £197.22k N/A £225.13k £259.32k £185.43k
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.58k N/A £4.37k £12.29k £10.50k
Income - Other £840.42k N/A £0 £9.49k £0
Income - Legacies £289.19k N/A £100 £115.42k £104.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £517.90k N/A £432.52k £492.79k £464.68k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.63k N/A £68.94k £72.13k £51.52k
Expenditure - Governance £5.16k N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0