HAINWORTH WOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1161769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £66.45k £48.73k £26.45k £30.26k £28.24k
Total expenditure £63.40k £48.43k £27.60k £19.26k £19.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.00k £36.64k £14.17k £22.45k £22.75k