IN THE MIX YOUTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1161486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.79k £58.14k £54.22k £57.33k £108.48k
Total expenditure £9.88k £54.01k £58.14k £36.26k £87.31k
Income from government contracts N/A £1.34k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £3.50k N/A £18.89k