Trustees THE RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1161196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Glenys Watt Chair 01 April 2024
None on record
Sune Kassimatis Trustee 28 October 2023
None on record
Anne-Marie Bainbridge Trustee 28 October 2023
WOMAN UP
Recently registered
Rosie Folkes Trustee 28 October 2023
None on record
Lindsey Marie Lovatt Trustee 13 May 2023
None on record
John Durrant Trustee 13 May 2023
None on record
Helen Margaret Maclagan Trustee 13 May 2023
THE HOSKING HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
Melanie Jean Good Rogers Trustee 27 February 2021
None on record
Alison Taylor Richmond Trustee 05 May 2018
None on record
Daniel Whatmough Trustee 13 April 2015
None on record
Nicolas Allen Trustee 07 April 2015
None on record
Dr SARA LUNT Trustee 07 April 2015
None on record
FRANCES HALAHAN Trustee 30 January 2015
None on record