BINGHAM LIBRARY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1163250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 March 2017 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required