BINGHAM LIBRARY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1163250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £210.99k £152.60k £155.13k £151.20k
Total expenditure £0 £161.31k £154.10k £139.24k £131.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A