HOPE HOUSE HAITI (UK)

Charity number: 1160880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £30.05k £89.63k £88.84k £91.74k £85.15k
Total expenditure £32.26k £93.07k £87.02k £86.02k £82.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A