HOPE HOUSE HAITI (UK)

Charity number: 1160880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Kemp Rev Trustee 25 November 2019
THE POINT CHURCH Received: On time
BEFRIENDED Received: On time
HURSTPIERPOINT COLLEGE LIMITED Received: On time
EMMA FRANCES WASYLIW Trustee 13 June 2013 None on record
Jean Whiting Trustee 12 December 2017 None on record
Yvonne Fulcher Trustee 03 July 2018 None on record
Joan Baker Chair 17 October 2017 None on record
Jonathan Paul Masters Trustee 14 April 2020 None on record