THE WOKINGHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity number: 1161498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £148.33k £131.52k £124.57k £129.44k £148.31k
Total expenditure £137.44k £123.92k £125.15k £135.11k £149.26k
Income from government contracts £75.50k £64.13k £64.13k N/A £90.38k
Income from government grants £7.80k £3.25k £3.25k £69.28k £10.53k