Financial history THE FOUNDRY SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1162688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £159.29k £221.75k £313.51k £347.37k £363.83k
Total expenditure £159.51k £196.04k £199.75k £340.24k £354.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £9.00k N/A £11.78k £12.94k