Trustees THE FOUNDRY SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1162688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark John North Trustee 08 November 2021
THE CHURCH ON THE BUS
Received: On time
Stephen William Clark Trustee 14 March 2019
THE SUNDAY CENTRE
Received: On time
DAVID BURTON Trustee 24 May 2016
THE WILKINSON METHODIST MARRIAGE CHARITY
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
TRINITY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ROBERT WILKINSON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
PAMELA BOULTON JP BA Trustee 09 November 2015
VICTORIA HALL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Howard James Hoyes Trustee 03 November 2015
None on record
Rev Jonathan Haigh Trustee 07 August 2014
RNV NEPAL
Recently registered
GREENHILL METHODIST CHURCH, SHEFFIELD
Received: On time
THE TERMINUS INITIATIVE
Received: On time
VICTORIA HALL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD SPORTS COMMENTARIES COMMITTEE FOR HOSPITAL PATIENTS AND THE BLIND
Received: On time
Rev Phillip George BORKETT Dip Th MBA Trustee 07 August 2014
None on record