Financial history INCLUSIVELY TAEKWONDO

Charity number: 1160621
Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £12.64k £17.74k £10.07k £11.96k £250
Total expenditure £13.66k £9.65k £11.54k £13.57k £5.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A