Trustees THE GREIG TRUST

Charity number: 1160318
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW MICHAEL BAKER Chair 04 February 2015
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF HORNSEY PARISH CHURCH (THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST GEORGE HORNSEY) LONDON DIOCESE
Received: On time
Charlotte Emily Adlam Trustee 03 March 2023
None on record
Inigo Rodney Milman Woolf Trustee 03 October 2022
THE HAMPSTEAD CHURCH MUSIC TRUST
Received: 15 days late
JOSEPH FOX
Received: On time
HAMPSTEAD CHURCHES YOUTH COMMITTEE
Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND
Received: On time
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN-AT-HAMPSTEAD
Received: On time
ST CLEMENT DANES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Penny Claire Roberts MBE Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Archdeacon John Edward Inskipp Hawkins Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
ELSWORTH CARLISLE GRIFFITH Trustee 04 February 2015
None on record
JOYE MANYAN Trustee 04 February 2015
None on record
Rev BRUCE BATSTONE Trustee 04 February 2015
THE HORNSEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
HORNSEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
NORTH LONDON PASTORAL ASSISTANTS SCHEME
Received: On time
TIMOTHY JOHN HAMMETT Trustee 04 February 2015
CPOTENTIAL TRUST
Received: On time