MISS MOLLIES RESCUE

Charity number: 1159985
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 June 2019 134 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 May 2018 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 May 2018 91 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 October 2016 On time Download