Trustees ALDER TRUST

Charity number: 1160393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID BARCLAY Trustee 25 May 2022
CITY LIFE CHURCH SOUTHAMPTON
Received: On time
Anthony Andrew Arthur Trustee 01 January 2022
THE BEATRICE PROJECT
Received: On time
Jamie Harding Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
SHEELAGH CLARKE Trustee 08 February 2019
None on record
Philip James Clarke Trustee 01 November 2016
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTH STONEHAM AND BASSETT
Received: On time