EAST LONDON MUSIC GROUP

Charity number: 1160841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sally Morrell Gatward Chair 13 July 2016
SYMPHONIC WIND ORCHESTRA OF NORTH LONDON Received: On time
SORREL BROOKES Trustee 17 December 2014
HELP ON YOUR DOORSTEP Received: On time
Hannah Metcalf Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
William Howard Williams Trustee 02 September 2019 None on record
Lucy Jane Campbell Trustee 22 July 2018 None on record