MARITIME CADET ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1160928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £2.63k £1.54k £2.79k £2.31k £1.41k
Total expenditure £1.97k £1.92k £2.88k £1.89k £1.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A