Financial history IGIVE

Charity number: 1161011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £37.42k £37.27k £34.08k £38.85k £32.52k
Total expenditure £31.53k £37.60k £42.79k £30.06k £42.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A