Accounts and annual returns IGIVE

Charity number: 1161011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window